(Dates indicate ordination as bishop)
Active
Archbishops
Most Rev. Gustavo García-Siller, M.Sp.S. (March 19, 2003), Archbishop of San Antonio
Most Rev. José H. Gómez (March 26, 2001), Archbishop of Los Angeles
Most Rev. Nelson J. Pérez (July 25, 2012), Archbishop of Philadelphia
Bishops
Most Rev. Oscar Cantú (June 2, 2008), Bishop of San Jose
Most Rev. Edgar M. da Cunha, S.D.V., D.D. (September 3, 2003), Bishop of Fall River
Most Rev. Felipe de Jesús Estévez (January 7, 2004), Bishop of St. Augustine
Most Rev. Daniel E. Flores (November 29, 2006), Bishop of Brownsville
Most Rev. Daniel E. Garcia (March 3, 2015), Bishop of Monterey
Most Rev. Alberto Rojas (August 10, 2011), Bishop of San Bernardino
Most Rev. Jaime Soto (May 31, 2000), Bishop of Sacramento
Most Rev. James A. Tamayo (March 10, 1993), Bishop of Laredo
Most Rev. Joe S. Vásquez (January 23, 2002), Bishop of Austin
Most Rev. Luis Rafael Zarama (August 6, 2009), Bishop of Raleigh
Auxiliary Bishops
Most Rev. Mario Alberto Avilés, C.O. (February 22, 2018), Auxiliary Bishop of Brownsville
Most Rev. Ramon Bejarano (April 21, 2020), Auxiliary Bishop of San Diego
Most Rev. Juan Miguel Betancourt, S.E.M.V. (October 18, 2018), Auxiliary Bishop of Hartford
Most Rev. Arturo Cepeda (May 5, 2011), Auxiliary Bishop of Detroit
Most Rev. Manuel A. Cruz (September 8, 2008), Auxiliary Bishop of Newark
Most Rev. Enrique Delgado (December 7, 2017), Auxiliary Bishop of Miami
Most Rev. Mario Dorsonville-Rodriguez, (April 20, 2015), Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, D.C.
Most Rev. Eusebio Elizondo, M.Sp.S. (June 6, 2005), Auxiliary Bishop of Seattle
Most Rev. Joseph A. Espaillat (March 1, 2022), Auxiliary Bishop of New York
Most Rev. Eduardo A. Nevares (July 19, 2010), Auxiliary Bishop of Phoenix
Most Rev. Jorge Rodriguez-Novelo, (November 4, 2016), Auxiliary Bishop of Denver
Most Rev. Luis M. Romero Fernandez, M. Id. (April 16, 2020), Auxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre
Most Rev. Paul Sánchez (July 11, 2012), Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn
Now with the Consejo Episcopal Latinoamericano (CELAM)
Most Rev. Álvaro Corrada del Rio, SJ (August 4, 1985), Bishop of Mayaguez, PR
Most Rev. Roberto González-Nieves, OFM (October 3, 1988), Archbishop of San Juan, PR
Retired
Most Rev. Gerald R. Barnes (March 18, 1992), Bishop Emeritus of San Bernardino
Most Rev. Octavio Cisneros, DD (August 22, 2006), Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn
Most Rev. Francisco González, S.F. (February 11, 2002), Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Washington
Most Rev. René H. Gracida (January 25, 1972), Bishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi
Most Rev. Josu Iriondo (December 12, 2001), Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of New York
Most Rev. Fernando Isern, D.D. (December 10, 2009), Bishop Emeritus of Pueblo
Most Rev. Armando X. Ochoa (February 23, 1987), Bishop Emeritus of Fresno
Most Rev. Raymundo J. Peña (December 13, 1976), Bishop Emeritus of Brownsville
Most Rev. Ricardo Ramírez (December 6, 1981), Bishop Emeritus of Las Cruces
Most Rev. Rutilio del Riego (September 20, 2005), Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Bernardino
Most Rev. Plácido Rodríguez, CMF (December 13, 1983), Bishop Emeritus of Lubbock
Most Rev. Alexander Salazar (November 4, 2004), Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles
Most Rev. Carlos A. Sevilla, SJ (January 25, 1989), Bishop Emeritus of Yakima
Most Rev. Gabino Zavala (March 19, 1994), Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles
Deceased
Most Rev. Emilio S. Allué, SDB (September 17, 1996), Auxiliary Bishop of Boston
Most Rev. David Arias, OAR (April 7, 1983), Auxiliary Bishop of Newark
Most Rev. Juan A. Arzube (March 25, 1971), Auxiliary Bishop of Los Angeles
Most Rev. Gilbert E. Chávez (June 21, 1974), Auxiliary Bishop of San Diego
Most Rev. Gilberto Fernández (September 3, 1997), Auxiliary Bishop of Miami
Most Rev. Cirilo B. Flores (March 19, 2009), Bishop of San Diego
Most Rev. Patrick F. Flores (May 5, 1970), Archbishop of San Antonio
Most Rev. Alphonse Gallegos, OAR (November 4, 1981), Auxiliary Bishop of Sacramento
Most Rev. Richard J. García (January 28, 1998), Bishop of Monterey
Most Rev. Francisco Garmendia (June 29, 1977), Auxiliary Bishop of New York
Most Rev. José Madera, MSpS (March 4, 1980), Auxiliary Bishop of the Archdiocese for the Military Services
Most Rev. Manuel D. Moreno (February 19, 1977), Bishop of Tucson
Most Rev. Agustín A. Román (March 24, 1979), Auxiliary Bishop of Miami
Most Rev. Enrique San Pedro, S.J. (June 29, 1986), Bishop of Brownsville
Most Rev. Robert F. Sánchez (July 1, 1974), Archbishop of Santa Fe
Most Rev. Arthur Tafoya (September 10, 1980), Bishop of Pueblo
Most Rev. René A. Valero (November 24, 1980), Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn
As of March 2021